NH HB108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-14 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2090h (New Title)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-14 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2090h (New Title)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Hampton to appoint a tree warden.
Title
Authorizing the town of Hampton to appoint a tree warden.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-14 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2090h (New Title) | |
2011-10-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2090h(NT) for Jan 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-05-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/24/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-05-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-05-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/17/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-04-20 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-04-12 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/20/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-28 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-10 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/22/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-01 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/8/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-11 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 8, PG.130 |