NH HB1069 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to material subject to disclosure under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to material subject to disclosure under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed House Journal 15 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 17 |
2024-06-03 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/03/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-05-31 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Turer Replaces Rep. Kuttab 05/31/2024 House Journal 15 P. 34 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Bradley, Chandley; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1966s and Requests CofC (Reps. Lynn, Wallace, M. Smith, Kuttab): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/28/2024 House Journal 14 P. 178 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1966s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Avard, Innis Withdraws roll call; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1966s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the first bill after break, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/22/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 1069 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1966s, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0406h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2024-0406h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0406h (NT) 02/01/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 7 |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2024 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary |