NH HB106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-140; House Journal 14, PG.247-249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-140; House Journal 14, PG.247-249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the demand for rent and other damages, and the repeal of the landlord-agent requirement.
Title
Relative to the demand for rent and other damages, and the repeal of the landlord-agent requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-30 - House - ITL (Y: 214 N: 140 NV: 11 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-140; House Journal 14, PG.247-249 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 30 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.131 |
2013-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.182 |