NH HB105 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB105
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the registration of medical spas.
Title
Relative to the registration of medical spas.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
Same As/Similar To
HB105 (Carry Over) 2023-09-18 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308