NH HB105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of motor vehicle registration information.
Title
Relative to the release of motor vehicle registration information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG.240 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 30 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.130 |
2013-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/23/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.182 |