NH HB1029 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reconsider (Rep. Sellers): Motion Failed DV 176-193 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reconsider (Rep. Sellers): Motion Failed DV 176-193 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exempting certain persons from requiring a New Hampshire landing license if such persons are not landing for the purpose of the sale of the lobster or crab they have caught.
Title
Relative to exempting certain persons from requiring a New Hampshire landing license if such persons are not landing for the purpose of the sale of the lobster or crab they have caught.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 179 NV: 8 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Sellers): Motion Failed DV 176-193 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 73 |
2024-03-08 | House | Notice of Reconsideration (Rep. Sellers) 03/08/2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-179 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 48 |
2024-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0519h |
2024-02-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/06/2024 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 20 |
2024-01-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |