NH HB1027 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to allowing child support to include the period of pregnancy.
Title
Relative to allowing child support to include the period of pregnancy.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Hynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/13/2024 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 11:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law |