NH HB1025 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to impeding, provoking, or harassing law enforcement officers.
Title
Relative to impeding, provoking, or harassing law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. Vanessa Sheehan [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] |
Rep. Stephen Pearson [R] | Rep. Lisa Post [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |