NH HB1021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 291; eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 291; eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain zoning regulation of land or structures used primarily for religious purposes.
Title
Prohibiting certain zoning regulation of land or structures used primarily for religious purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 291; eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2113EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2113e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1653s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1653s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1653s, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |