NH HB102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to municipal ordinances regarding the use of plastics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal ordinances regarding the use of plastics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-11-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2819h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-30HouseExecutive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-09HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-08-28House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-08-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-08-20House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/03/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-08-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 08/27/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-08-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 08/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-06-11House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 37

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback