NH HB102 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to mandatory headlamp use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to mandatory headlamp use.



2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-02-16HouseLay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 43
2017-02-16HouseSpecial Order to 2/16/2017 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 57
2017-02-15HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Manley) 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 6
2017-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15
2017-01-24HouseExecutive Session: 02/01/2017 04:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-05HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments