NH HB102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 129; Effective Date 8/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 129; Effective Date 8/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consideration of warrant articles.
Title
Relative to consideration of warrant articles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 129; Effective Date 8/11/2015 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley moved Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1496s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1496s, New Title, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Special Order HB 102 to 5/14/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1496s, New Title, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-02-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 14, PG. 274-275 |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 4 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar10, PG 151 |
2015-01-14 | House | Executive Session: 1/20/2015 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |