NH HB102 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 08/17/2012; Chapter 0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 08/17/2012; Chapter 0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to interagency information sharing by financial services regulators.
Title
Relative to interagency information sharing by financial services regulators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 08/17/2012; Chapter 0241 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2613 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2406c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2586 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2406c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-31 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2012-2406c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2012-05-31 | House Conferee Change: Rep Itse Replaces Rep Gidge; House Journal 47, PG.2507 | |
2012-05-22 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/29/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate President Appoints: Senators White, Luther, and Larsen; Senate Journal 12, Pg.470 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Sen. Carson Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.470 | |
2012-02-22 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Muro, McGuinness, and Gidge; House Journal 20, PG.1199 | |
2012-02-22 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment and Requests C of C (Rep Jennifer Coffey): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1199 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0199s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.55 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee Amendment 0199s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.52 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0199s, New Title, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-10-20 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 11/8/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 43 | |
2011-09-01 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 9/8/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 36 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.303 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Hearing: 4/28/11, Room 100, State House, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0266h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.695 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0266h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.695 | |
2011-03-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0266h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.584 | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0266h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.523 | |
2011-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 302 3:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2011-01-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 Banking/Business Div | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |