NH HB1016 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire state flag.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire state flag.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim McGough [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Jonathan Stone [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/13/2024 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |