NH HB1 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making appropriations for the expenses of certain departments of the state for fiscal years ending June 30, 2018 and June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the expenses of certain departments of the state for fiscal years ending June 30, 2018 and June 30, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 162 N: 196 NV: 11 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 75 N: 282 NV: 10 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 134 N: 220 NV: 13 Abs: 27) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-04-05HouseLay on Table (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2017 House Journal 12 P. 33
2017-04-05HouseFLAM #2017-1302h (Rep. Eaton): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 162-196 04/05/2017 House Journal 12 P. 28
2017-04-05HouseFLAM #2017-1282h (Rep. Ammon): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 75-282 04/05/2017 House Journal 12 P. 23
2017-04-05HouseAmendment #2017-1179h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 134-220 04/05/2017 House Journal 12 P. 19
2017-03-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-03-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1179h for 04/05/2017 (Vote 16-9; Regular Calendar)
2017-03-21House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-21HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-22House==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 03/23/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-22House==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 03/23/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2017-03-16HouseDivision III Work Session: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-16HouseDivision II Work Session: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2017-03-16House==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 03/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-03-16HouseDivision III Work Session: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-16HouseDivision II Work Session: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2017-03-16HouseDivision I Work Session: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-03-16HouseDivision III Work Session: 03/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-03-16HouseDivision II Work Session: 03/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2017-03-16House==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 03/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2017-03-01HousePublic Hearing: 03/13/2017 03:00 PM Representatives Hall
2017-03-01HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2017 05:30 PM Silver Center for the Arts at Plymouth State University - Plymouth NH
2017-03-01HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2017 04:30 PM Derry Town Hall - Derry NH
2017-02-10HouseIntroduced 02/09/2017 and referred to Finance House Journal 6 P. 30

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback