NH CACR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 282-74 03/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the right to govern. Providing that the people of the state may enactlocal laws that protect health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the right to govern. Providing that the people of the state may enactlocal laws that protect health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 282-74 03/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-03-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 29
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 47

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback