NH CACR7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future CACR7
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public education. Providing that the general court shall have the authority to define standards of accountability, mitigate local disparities in educational opportunity and fiscal capacity, and have full discretion to determine the amount of state funding for education.
Title
Relating to public education. Providing that the general court shall have the authority to define standards of accountability, mitigate local disparities in educational opportunity and fiscal capacity, and have full discretion to determine the amount of state funding for education.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-12-29 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
CACR7 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass