NH CACR6 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023 Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023 Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the retirement age for judges. Providing that the mandatory judicial retirement age shall be increased from 70 to 75.
Title
Relating to the retirement age for judges. Providing that the mandatory judicial retirement age shall be increased from 70 to 75.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] | Rep. Dan Hynes [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 321 N: 27 NV: 19 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 321 N: 27 NV: 25 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 321 N: 27 NV: 19 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 321 N: 27 NV: 25 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023 Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 321-27 By Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 8 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/30/2023 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 21 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary |