NH CACR6 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-153 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-153 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to conflict of interest. Providing that no member of the general court shall sponsor, advocate for, nor vote on any legislation which would create a financial conflict of interest.
Title
Relating to conflict of interest. Providing that no member of the general court shall sponsor, advocate for, nor vote on any legislation which would create a financial conflict of interest.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Smith [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 208 N: 153 NV: 12 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-153 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 41 |
2017-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 7-4; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2016-12-29 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 23 |