NH CACR6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to county attorneys. Providing that county attorneys shall be appointed.
Title
Relating to county attorneys. Providing that county attorneys shall be appointed.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Rep. James Belanger [R] | Sen. David Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/15, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |