NH CACR6 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
2nd (New Title) relating to taxation. Providing that a 3/5 vote is required to pass legislation imposing new or increased taxes or license fees, or to authorize the issuance of state bonds and providing that the general court shall appropriate funds for payment of interest and installments of principle of all state bonds.
Title
2nd (New Title) relating to taxation. Providing that a 3/5 vote is required to pass legislation imposing new or increased taxes or license fees, or to authorize the issuance of state bonds and providing that the general court shall appropriate funds for payment of interest and installments of principle of all state bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - OTPA 1169H(NT) (Y: 256 N: 117 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - FLAM 1169H(NT) (REP O'BRIEN ET AL) (Y: 265 N: 107 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - SHALL RULE OF THE CHAIR BE UPHELD (REP NORELLI) (Y: 270 N: 101 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - ITL (Y: 119 N: 251 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - SUSPEND RULES TO TAKE UP FURTHER ACTION ON CACR6 (REP BETTENCOURT) (Y: 258 N: 114 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0699H(NT) (Y: 234 N: 118 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - FLAM 1169H(NT) (REP O'BRIEN ET AL) (Y: 265 N: 107 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - SHALL RULE OF THE CHAIR BE UPHELD (REP NORELLI) (Y: 270 N: 101 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - ITL (Y: 119 N: 251 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - SUSPEND RULES TO TAKE UP FURTHER ACTION ON CACR6 (REP BETTENCOURT) (Y: 258 N: 114 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0699H(NT) (Y: 234 N: 118 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/11/11, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 15, Pg.291 | |
2011-03-30 | House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Tamburello): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG.1114-1121 | |
2011-03-30 | House Reconsideration (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 104-269; House Journal 34, PG.1113-1114 | |
2011-03-30 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1169h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 256-117 by Required Three-Fifths; House Journal 34, PG.1111-1113 | |
2011-03-30 | House Floor Amendment #2011-1169h (New Title) (Rep O'Brien et al) Adopted, Regular Calendar 265-107; House Journal 34, PG.1106-1111 | |
2011-03-30 | House Shall the Rule of the Chair be Upheld (Rep Norelli): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 270-101; House Journal 34, PG.1107-1109 | |
2011-03-30 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment (Rep Jasper); House Journal 34, PG.1106 | |
2011-03-30 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 119-251; House Journal 34, PG.1104-1106 | |
2011-03-30 | House Suspend House Rules to Take Up Further Action on CACR6 (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 258-114 by Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 34, PG.1102-1104 | |
2011-03-30 | House Remove from the Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 248-118; House Journal 34, PG.1102 | |
2011-03-16 | House Lay on the Table (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 341-14; House Journal 28, PG.897 | |
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Norelli); House Journal 28, PG.893-897 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0699h(NT): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 234-118 Lacking Constitutionally Required Three-Fifths Vote; House Journal 28, PG.893-897 | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment #0699h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.893-894 | |
2011-03-16 | House Special Order to Next Order of Business (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 244-93; House Journal 28, PG.893 | |
2011-03-09 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.570 | |
2011-03-09 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0699h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.580 | |
2011-03-09 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0699h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.570 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 2:00 PM)== | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 189 |