NH CACR4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to right to govern. Providing that the people of the state may enactlocal laws that protect health, safety, and welfare.
Title
Relating to right to govern. Providing that the people of the state may enactlocal laws that protect health, safety, and welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 47 |