NH CACR35 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Lay CACR0035 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 260-75 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Lay CACR0035 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 260-75 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cannabis. Providing that all adults have the right to possess, use, and cultivate cannabis, subject to regulation by the legislature.
Title
Relating to cannabis. Providing that all adults have the right to possess, use, and cultivate cannabis, subject to regulation by the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Lay CACR0035 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 260-75 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 03:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 03:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2021-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |