NH CACR34 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Lay CACR0034 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 266-68 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use, sale, or cultivation of cannabis. Providing that the state shall make no law prohibiting the use, sale, or cultivation of cannabis for persons over 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use, sale, or cultivation of cannabis. Providing that the state shall make no law prohibiting the use, sale, or cultivation of cannabis for persons over 18 years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-18HouseLay CACR0034 on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted DV 266-68 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
2022-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2022-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
2022-03-07HouseExecutive Session: 01/20/2022 02:30 pm State House Reps Hall
2022-01-12HousePublic Hearing: 01/20/2022 02:30 pm State House Reps Hall
2021-12-14HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback