NH CACR21 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the oath of civil officers. Providing that the default oath of office shall be a non-religious oath.
Title
Relating to the oath of civil officers. Providing that the default oath of office shall be a non-religious oath.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Sherry Dutzy [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] |
Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/13/2024 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 32 |