NH CACR21 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to registers of probate. Providing that eliminating the office of register of probate and all references to such office.
Title
Relating to registers of probate. Providing that eliminating the office of register of probate and all references to such office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1561s, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, by necessary 3/5, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2022-1561s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 103, State House, 08:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 294-43 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-03 | House | Introduced and referred to Judiciary |