NH CACR21 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to alcohol and drug abuse prevention. Providing that a portion of liquor commission revenue shall be used for alcohol and drug abuse prevention.
Title
Relative to alcohol and drug abuse prevention. Providing that a portion of liquor commission revenue shall be used for alcohol and drug abuse prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Special Order to the Call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |