NH CACR20 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 270-63; House Journal 21, PG.1263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 270-63; House Journal 21, PG.1263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to meetings of the general court. Providing that the general court shall meet biennially.
Title
Relating to meetings of the general court. Providing that the general court shall meet biennially.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 270-63; House Journal 21, PG.1263 | |
2012-02-15 | House Special Order to End of Next Week's Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.967 | |
2012-02-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Tregenza); House Journal 16, PG.909 | |
2012-02-07 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1051 | |
2012-01-25 | House Executive Session: 2/7/2012 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2012-01-23 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2012 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2012-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2011-11-14 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 7, PG.366 |