NH CACR2 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 201-170 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Taxes. Providing that any broad-based sales tax shall be prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes. Providing that any broad-based sales tax shall be prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - OTP (Y: 201 N: 170 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 201-170 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 70
2021-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 62
2021-02-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/11/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99381153388 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback