NH CACR2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to natural rights of children. Providing that children have a natural right to be protected by their parents.
Title
Relating to natural rights of children. Providing that children have a natural right to be protected by their parents.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 58 |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-09 | House | Vacated to Children and Family Law Without Objection 01/04/2017 House Journal 2 P. 15 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 23 |