NH CACR2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dedicated funds. Providing that funds shall be used solely for the purpose of the fund.
Title
Relating to dedicated funds. Providing that funds shall be used solely for the purpose of the fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. James Grenier [R] |
Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Thomas Laware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11 |
2015-09-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-16 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-08-25 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 9:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-09 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202=RECESSED= |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 212 |