NH CACR2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 302-38; House Journal 16, PG.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 302-38; House Journal 16, PG.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to taxation. Providing that taxes imposed by the state of New Hampshire or its subdivisions may be graduated.
Title
Relating to taxation. Providing that taxes imposed by the state of New Hampshire or its subdivisions may be graduated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 302-38; House Journal 16, PG.316 |
2013-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 11, PG.157 |
2013-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 6 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.157 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.185 |