NH CACR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Removed from the Consent List; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Removed from the Consent List; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the American flag. Providing that no person shall burn an American flag except as a dignified means of disposing of a worn or damaged flag.
Title
Relating to the American flag. Providing that no person shall burn an American flag except as a dignified means of disposing of a worn or damaged flag.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Removed from the Consent List; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Ought to Pass; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Without Objection, take up at the present time, Motion Adopted, 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 2 |