NH CACR17 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to initiative and referendum powers. Providing that initiative and referendum powers shall be reserved to the people of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to initiative and referendum powers. Providing that initiative and referendum powers shall be reserved to the people of the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 29
2018-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback