NH CACR16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to recall elections. Providing that the general court may authorize recall elections.
Title
Relating to recall elections. Providing that the general court may authorize recall elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] | Rep. Ryan Buchanan [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 41 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 23 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/02/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-02-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/19/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 33 |