NH CACR16 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1936e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to privacy. Providing that an individual's right to live free of governmental intrusion is natural, essential, and inherent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to privacy. Providing that an individual's right to live free of governmental intrusion is natural, essential, and inherent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1936e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1936e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-03-21SenateHearing: 03/29/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Rules and Enrolled Bills; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0118h: Motion Adopted DV 235-96 By Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 39
2018-02-22HouseFLAM # 2018-0757h (NT) (Rep. T. Smith): Amendment Failed DV 79-255 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 39
2018-02-22HouseAmendment # 2018-0118h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 38
2018-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2018-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0118h (NT) for 02/22/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 19
2018-02-07HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback