NH CACR16 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to parental rights. Providing that parents have the natural right to control the health, education, and welfare of their children.
Title
Relating to parental rights. Providing that parents have the natural right to control the health, education, and welfare of their children.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Frank Edelblut [R] |
Rep. Robert Hull [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] |
Rep. David Murotake [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - OTP (Y: 174 N: 136 NV: 26 Abs: 61) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - OTP (Y: 174 N: 136 NV: 50 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - OTP (Y: 174 N: 136 NV: 50 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Died on Table |
2016-03-10 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. P. Long): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 73 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 174-136 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 71 |
2016-03-02 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 77 |
2016-03-02 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 77 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 4 P. 24 |