NH CACR15 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulation of searches and seizures. Providing that certain information in a legally enforceable contract shall be secure from unreasonable searches and seizures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of searches and seizures. Providing that certain information in a legally enforceable contract shall be secure from unreasonable searches and seizures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseSpecial Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020
2020-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 32
2020-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback