NH CACR14 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-159 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-159 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to unions. Providing that all workers have the right to join a union.
Title
Relating to unions. Providing that all workers have the right to join a union.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Labranche [D] | Rep. Eric Gallager [D] | Rep. Donald Bouchard [D] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] |
Rep. Sherry Frost [D] | Rep. Stacie-Marie Laughton [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 182 N: 159 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-159 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/27/2022 09:30 am State HouseReps Hall |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |