NH CACR14 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reproductive medical decisions. Providing that the state shall not infringe or unduly inconvenience the right of reproductive medical decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reproductive medical decisions. Providing that the state shall not infringe or unduly inconvenience the right of reproductive medical decisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-03-05HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 244-105 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 9
2020-02-20HouseSpecial Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020
2020-02-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2020-02-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 32
2020-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 33

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback