NH CACR14 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-108 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to natural rights of children. Providing that children have a natural right to be protected by their parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to natural rights of children. Providing that children have a natural right to be protected by their parents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 216 N: 108 NV: 31 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-108 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 61
2018-03-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 36
2018-02-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback