NH CACR14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Lay on the Table (Rep L.Ober): Motion Adopted Division Vote 346-27 By Required Three-Fifths; House Journal 48, PG.1654
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Lay on the Table (Rep L.Ober): Motion Adopted Division Vote 346-27 By Required Three-Fifths; House Journal 48, PG.1654
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public education. Providing that the general court shall have the authority to define standards for public education, establish standards of accountability, mitigate local disparities in educational opportunity and fiscal capacity, and shall have full discretion to determine the amount of state funding for education.
Title
Relating to public education. Providing that the general court shall have the authority to define standards for public education, establish standards of accountability, mitigate local disparities in educational opportunity and fiscal capacity, and shall have full discretion to determine the amount of state funding for education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Lay on the Table (Rep L.Ober): Motion Adopted Division Vote 346-27 By Required Three-Fifths; House Journal 48, PG.1654 | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee Report: Without Recommendation for June 1 (RC); House Calendar 43, PG.1501 | |
2011-04-05 | House Executive Session: 4/14/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 209)== | |
2011-04-05 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/14/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 209)== | |
2011-04-05 | House Public Hearing: 4/11/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 207)== | |
2011-03-31 | House Introduced and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 35, PG.1241 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.239 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1142s, New Title, 3/5 necessary, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.227 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Amendment 1142s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.227 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1142s, New Title, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Hearing: 3/22/11, Room 103, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 7, Pg.64 |