NH CACR12 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the election of judges. Providing that judges be elected for specific terms.
Title
Relating to the election of judges. Providing that judges be elected for specific terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 138 N: 202 NV: 15 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 38 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 138-202 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 36 |
2018-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 19 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 25 |