NH CACR10 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.741
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.741
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing a New Hampshire state reserve fund. Providing that the New Hampshire state reserve fund shall be under the authority of the state treasurer and dedicated to offset the business profits tax, business enterprise tax, and the interest and dividends tax for purposes of lowering the rates of such taxes.
Title
Relating to establishing a New Hampshire state reserve fund. Providing that the New Hampshire state reserve fund shall be under the authority of the state treasurer and dedicated to offset the business profits tax, business enterprise tax, and the interest and dividends tax for purposes of lowering the rates of such taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.741 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.543 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 2:00 PM)== | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 196 |