NE LR85 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Legislature rejects hate, discrimination, and acts of violence, including violence against Asian-Americans, based on race, national origin, or religion
Title
Provide the Legislature rejects hate, discrimination, and acts of violence, including violence against Asian-Americans, based on race, national origin, or religion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Pahls name added |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Speaker's Announcement |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Laid over |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=45322 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR85.pdf |