NE LR5CA | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to limit the percentage of funding for schools that comes from property taxes
Title
Constitutional amendment to limit the percentage of funding for schools that comes from property taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2019 |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36876 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR5CA.pdf |