NE LR539 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Summary
Encourage the Congress of the United States to adhere to the principles of federalism in accord with the Ninth and Tenth Amendments to the United States Constitution
Title
Encourage the Congress of the United States to adhere to the principles of federalism in accord with the Ninth and Tenth Amendments to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-13 | Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Reported to Legislature for further consideration | |
2010-04-08 | Lautenbaugh name added | |
2010-04-01 | Notice of hearing for April 08, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Reference Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Laid over | |
2010-03-30 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11451 |