NE LR538 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - President/Speaker signed
Summary
Provide the Legislature remains committed to seeking a federal balanced budget
Title
Provide the Legislature remains committed to seeking a federal balanced budget
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-13 | Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | White name added | |
2010-04-09 | Reported to Legislature for further consideration | |
2010-04-08 | Sullivan name added | |
2010-04-08 | Price name added | |
2010-04-08 | Pahls name added | |
2010-04-08 | Karpisek name added | |
2010-04-08 | Janssen name added | |
2010-04-01 | Notice of hearing for April 08, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Reference Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Laid over | |
2010-03-29 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11008 |