NE LR526 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-14 - Notice of hearing for December 02, 2016
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-14 - Notice of hearing for December 02, 2016
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine municipal classifications
Title
Interim study to examine municipal classifications
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 02, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30183 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR526.pdf |