NE LR5 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Resolution to ratify an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to regulation of child labor
Title
Legislative Resolution to ratify an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to regulation of child labor
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |